Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations - Employees' Pension System
Sponsored by
Delegate Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Rejecting items included in the Resolution of the General Assembly Compensation Commission in 2014; providing that provisions related to salaries and benefits shall be as provided in the Resolution of the General Assembly Compensation Commission submitted in 2010 and amended by Joint Resolution 4 of 2010, except that items related to retirement benefits shall be amended to require specified members of the Legislative Pension Plan to participate in the Employees' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/25/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/25/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM