Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
National Goal of Debt-Free Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barron, Brooks, Carr, Carter, Chang, Conaway, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Jackson, Jones, Kaiser, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Supporting statewide and nationwide policy and legislative efforts to ensure that students have access to debt-free higher education at public colleges and universities.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM