Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Arora, Carr, Elliott, Guzzone, Healey, Ivey, Kach, Krebs, McComas, Olszewski, Serafini, Stocksdale, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying to Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the United States Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the states, to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution to change the method of the apportionment of the seats in the House of Representatives and the drawing of the legislative districts for those seats; requiring approval from a majority of the legislatures of the states to change the method of Congressional districting and apportionment; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM