Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Folden, Glenn, Jameson, Kipke, Malone, McComas, and Szeliga
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Commemorating the bicentennial of the birth of Frederick Douglass; and providing that a copy of this resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to certain individuals.
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0006
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 33
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 34
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Text - Chapter - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM