Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Women Veterans Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Patterson, Healey, Glenn, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Gaines, Jones, Kipke, McComas, McIntosh, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Stein, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating March 13 as Women Veterans Day.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Sample-Hughes) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Women Veterans Day
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Women Veterans Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Sample-Hughes) Adopted (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Women Veterans Day
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {603527/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Women Veterans Day
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page