Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available Technology
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a user of an on-site sewage disposal system that utilizes the best available technology for nitrogen removal from paying the Bay Restoration Fee.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1208 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/06/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/06/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 4
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM