Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions During State of Emergency
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a pharmacist, during a state of emergency, may refill a prescription for a drug for which the refill has not been authorized; providing that a pharmacist who is working in Maryland, instead of the area declared an emergency, may refill the prescription if the federal or any state government, instead of the federal or this State's government, has declared a state of emergency; increasing the maximum quantity from a 14-day to a 30-day supply that may be dispensed under the prescription refill; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0591
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/18/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2015
Legislative Date
1/07/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/05/2015 11/18/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/07/2015 1/07/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2015 2/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 12-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM