Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Built to Learn Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Senator Peters, the President, and Senator Miller
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring or authorizing, under certain circumstances, the Maryland Stadium Authority to contract for, manage, and oversee certain public school facility projects; authorizing the Prince George's County government and Board of Education to enter into a certain public-private partnership to enhance the delivery of public school construction projects in the county; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020, to include in the annual budget certain supplemental funding to be used for certain educational purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0001
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 8 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Built to Learn Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Built to Learn Act of 2020
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/10/2020 10:54 AM