Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsored by
Senators Miller and Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "other tobacco products" to include certain consumable products and the components or parts of those products and to exclude certain other products; altering the sales and use tax rate imposed on sales of certain electronic smoking devices and vaping liquid; altering the tobacco tax rate for certain cigarettes and other tobacco products; imposing a tax on annual gross revenues derived from digital advertising services, including advertisement services on a digital interface in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0695
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues - Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {839438/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {839438/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {839438/2 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues - Taxation
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {839438/1 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {839438/1 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Substitute Committee Amendment {839438/2 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/4/2020 5:21 PM