Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on specified public land on any Sunday during the spring turkey hunting season in Dorchester County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0066
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/09/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 11/09/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {624832/1 Report Adopted 14
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 16
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 18
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (129-8) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM