Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program to authorize tax credits against the State income tax, public service company franchise tax, and insurance premium tax equal to 50% of the donation made to specified eligible higher education institutions; requiring the donations to be used for specified purposes in priority funding areas; authorizing, each year, the Maryland Higher Education Commission to allocate up to $20,000,000 in tax credits to eligible higher education institutions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0676
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
8/26/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/05/2015 8/26/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 1-101, 17-401 through 17-406 )
(   6-123 )
(   10-737, 8-418 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM