Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Minimum Wage Rate - Exceptions - Social Service Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsored by
Senator Getty
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing nonprofit organizations that provide social services to residents of the State and have an annual operating budget of $250,000 or less to pay employees 85% of the State minimum wage or $7.25 per hour; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
10/08/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/05/2015 10/08/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM