Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $20,000 to $90,000 the salary of an attorney employed by the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Board to hire an attorney on a contractual basis to perform work that the attorney employed by the Board is unable to perform because of a conflict of interest; and prohibiting the Board from spending more than $10,000 each year to hire a contractual attorney.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0640
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {764531/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 39
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 41
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM