Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Carroll County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring a specified organization to obtain a permit from the Board of County Commissioners of Carroll County; requiring a participant in a card game, card tournament, or casino event to be at least 21 years old; requiring the permit holder to file with the Board of County Commissioners of Carroll County a financial report that includes specified information on prize winners; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
10/15/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2015
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
6
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/22/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {645964/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/05/2015 10/15/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/13/2015 1/13/2015 Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2015 1/16/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/19/2015 1/19/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 4
Senate 1/19/2015 1/19/2015 Second Reading Passed 4
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 6
House 1/22/2015 1/22/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 7
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {645964/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-906, 13-906.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM