Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and Reauthorization
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office of Minority Affairs)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring minority business enterprises serving as subcontractors on specified contracts to submit, within 10 days after notice from the prime contractor of the State's intent to award a contract, documentation providing the percentage and type of work assigned to the subcontractor to the procurement officer and to the contractor; providing the findings of the General Assembly based on a specified disparity study; requiring a specified report on the Minority Business Enterprise Program be submitted by September 30, 2021; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2016
Legislative Date
11/15/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2017
Legislative Date
1/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {846587/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2016 11/15/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and Reauthorization
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2017 1/09/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {904138/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and Reauthorization
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {846587/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and Reauthorization
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text - Chapter - Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and Reauthorization
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-301.1, 14-303, 14-309 )
(   2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM