Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Meade High School Concession Stand
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 to authorize real property, in kind contributions, and funds expended prior to June 1, 2012, to count towards the matching fund requirement for a grant for the Meade High School Concession Stand; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1506
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Prior authorizations that were altered during the 2013 Session were amended into the Omnibus Bill (HB 1372). Individual prior authorizations were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 1372 to alter prior authorizations.
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/17/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/17/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page