Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Canvass of Votes - Public Observation
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the definition of "canvass" as it applies to votes cast during early voting; providing that a board of canvassers and the staff of a local board may be observed as they complete each part of the canvass by authorized observers and any other individuals who wish to be present; providing that a candidate, a political party and any other group of voters supporting or opposing a candidate, principle, or proposition on the ballot has the right to designate a registered voter as an observer at each counting center; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/03/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {235165/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/05/2015 11/03/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {804531/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {235165/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 61
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM