Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the continued detention, beyond emergency detention, of a child under the age of 12 years, unless the child is alleged to have committed murder in the first degree, attempted murder in the first degree, rape in the first degree, or sexual offense in the first degree under specified provisions of law.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/20/2016
Legislative Date
10/20/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/20/2016 10/20/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM