Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that punitive damages may be awarded in a civil action only if the plaintiff proves by clear and convincing evidence that the defendant acted with wantonness, fraud, or malice; requiring a trier of fact to consider a defendant's liability for punitive damages concurrently with all other issues presented in the action; requiring a trier of fact to determine the amount of punitive damages to be awarded based on certain factors under certain circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0836 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM