Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain revenue, fees, and examination and investigation fees and assessments relating to the licensure of collection agencies, consumer lenders, installment lenders, sales finance companies, mortgage lenders, check cashing services, and credit services businesses to be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund; altering the composition and the purpose of the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0187
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/18/2017
Legislative Date
9/18/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {677476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/18/2017 9/18/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 10
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Committee Amendment {677476/1 Adopted 10
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Referred Economic Matters 13
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203.3, 11-402.1, 11-503.2, 11-610, 12-104.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM