Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Kelley, Klausmeier, Montgomery, Pugh, Reilly, and Waugh
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that the prohibition against selling, distributing, or offering for sale an electronic device to a minor that can be used to deliver nicotine includes any component for the device or product used to refill or resupply the device; clarifying that the exception to the prohibition for devices approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration applies only to devices for sale as a tobacco cessation product; changing a violation of the prohibition from a misdemeanor to a civil infraction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0489
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/06/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707972/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273499/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-44)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/05/2015 11/06/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/14/2015 1/14/2015 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {707972/1 Report Adopted 18A
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18A
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary 22
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {273499/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-44) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM