Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's P-20 Leadership Council - College and Career Readiness and College Completion Reporting - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified reporting requirement of the Governor's P-20 Leadership Council relating to college and career readiness and college completion strategies.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
6/29/2016
Legislative Date
6/29/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations Ways and Means
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 6/29/2016 6/29/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Governor's P-20 Leadership Council - College and Career Readiness and College Completion Reporting - Revisions
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Governor's P-20 Leadership Council - College and Career Readiness and College Completion Reporting - Revisions
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Appropriations Ways and Means 36
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 61A
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Text - Chapter - Governor's P-20 Leadership Council - College and Career Readiness and College Completion Reporting - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-207, 11-209, 24-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM