Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain students residing in Somerset County may enroll full time in certain community colleges and pay no tuition or fees for up to 3 years if certain conditions are met; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to pay 100% of in-county tuition and fees for certain eligible students; requiring that certain student financial aid be applied to pay an eligible student's tuition and fees before determining the amount required to be paid by the Commission; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0329
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1131 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or Fees
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   16-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page