Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts – Court Dog Therapy Program – Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Court Dog and Child Witness Program to be the Court Dog Therapy Program; expanding the application of the Program to veterans participating in a certain veterans treatment court; establishing that the Program shall be in the circuit court of each county that participates in the Program and in the District Court of each county that participates in the Program under certain circumstances; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0186
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
6/29/2020
Legislative Date
6/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts – Court Dog Therapy Program – Veterans Treatment Courts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 6/29/2020 6/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts – Court Dog Therapy Program – Veterans Treatment Courts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 3:00 PM