Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Replacement Surcharge
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a gas company to recover costs associated with infrastructure replacement projects through a gas infrastructure replacement surcharge on customer bills; requiring project cost calculations to include specified elements; specifying how the pretax rate of return is calculated and adjusted and what it includes; stating that the intent of the General Assembly is to accelerate infrastructure improvements by establishing a mechanism for gas companies to recover reasonable and prudent costs of infrastructure replacement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0089
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0541 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/18/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2013
Legislative Date
1/07/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {867177/1
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {867177/1
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (21-22)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-12)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {293726/1 Rejected (15-29)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {163725/1 Rejected (19-21)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-19)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 9/18/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2013 1/07/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {867177/1 16
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Laid Over (Senator Astle) Adopted 16
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {867177/1 17
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 17
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (21-22) 17
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-12) 17
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 17
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {293726/1 Rejected (15-29) 18
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {163725/1 Rejected (19-21) 18
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 20
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 23
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (116-19) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Returned Passed 31
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM