Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Uninsured Employers' Fund - Additional Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Amount
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Uninsured Employers' Fund)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the percentage of the additional assessment from 1% to up to 3% that the Uninsured Employers' Fund Board may direct the Workers' Compensation Commission to impose on certain awards and settlements if the Board determines that the reserves of the Uninsured Employers' Fund are inadequate to meet anticipated losses.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Uninsured Employers' Fund - Additional Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Amount
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM