Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County and the City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the issuance of a Class 9 limited distillery license in Anne Arundel County and the City of Annapolis to a holder of a Class D beer, wine and liquor license; allowing a holder of a Class 9 license to distill, rectify, bottle, or sell up to 100,000 gallons of brandy, rum, whiskey, alcohol, and neutral spirits each calendar year; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1590
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/15/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454739/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/15/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {454739/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 39
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 41
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-102, 10-401, 11-102, 11-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM