Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Peters, Carter, Feldman, and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, dispensary, or independent testing laboratory; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0568
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/13/2018
Legislative Date
7/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2019
Legislative Date
1/03/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/13/2018 7/13/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208, 10-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM