Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the scope of certain provisions of the Maryland Egg Law to include certain eggs produced from certain poultry; requiring shell eggs produced from poultry other than domesticated chickens to be sold by net quantity; authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to conduct certain examinations, testing, and sampling for certain purposes; specifying that shell eggs are adulterated when the shell eggs are subjected to certain contamination or conditions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2020
Legislative Date
1/02/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Senate 1/02/2020 1/02/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/24/2020 3:33 PM