Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing Board
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law relating to the required ranks of correctional officer members of a hearing board under the Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights; altering a specified provision of law to require that correctional officers assigned to serve on a hearing board be selected from a list of correctional officers eligible to serve on disciplinary hearing boards established by the Secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, or the Secretary's designee; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/02/2016
Legislative Date
11/02/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/02/2016 11/02/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing Board
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM