Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including income from certain retirement plans within a certain subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain individuals; altering the calculation of the subtraction modification; increasing the maximum amount of the subtraction modification allowed for certain taxable years; and prohibiting an individual from qualifying for the subtraction if the total income from all qualified plans for the taxable year exceeds $100,000.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0405
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/18/2017
Legislative Date
7/18/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/18/2017 7/18/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM