Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a local department of social services to maintain specified reports of suspected abuse or neglect and all assessments and investigative findings for specified periods of time; and increasing the time period after which a local department is required to expunge specified reports and records of suspected child abuse and neglect.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0007
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1055 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/18/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/22/2015
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {278875/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {152514/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Senators Ramirez, Norman, and Raskin
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/05/2015 11/18/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/22/2015 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {278875/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Judiciary 28
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {152514/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 58
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Senators Ramirez, Norman, and Raskin 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM