Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person proposing to close or partially close a hospital that receives State and county funding from closing or partially closing the hospital except under specified circumstances; requiring the county board of health for the county in which the hospital is located to hold a public hearing at a location within 5 miles of the hospital and within 30 days of receiving notice of the proposed closure or partial closure; requiring the board of health to consider specified factors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1121
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/18/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 8/18/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM