Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Brochin, Lee, Muse, and Smith
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enforcement only as a secondary offense for a violation of the prohibition under specified circumstances against a person driving a vehicle on a highway with any object, material, or obstruction hanging from the rearview mirror that interferes with the clear view of the driver through the windshield.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1335
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0053 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/12/2016
Legislative Date
7/12/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {548273/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-29)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/12/2016 7/12/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {548273/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (109-29) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
(   21-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page