Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Professional Engineers - Qualifications for Licensure - Experience Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain applicants for a license to practice engineering to have a certain number of years of progressive work experience in engineering to qualify for a license; and repealing a provision of law that required a certain applicant for a license to practice engineering to have at least 5 years of work experience in responsible charge of other engineers.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2020
Legislative Date
1/02/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Professional Engineers - Qualifications for Licensure - Experience Requirements
Senate 1/02/2020 1/02/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM