Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Aging)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee; providing for the purpose and the membership of the Advisory Committee; requiring the Advisory Committee to submit a specified annual report; providing for the terms of the members of the Advisory Committee; requiring the Office of the Long-Term Care Ombudsman to staff the Advisory Committee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/10/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/10/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-901, 10-912 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM