Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certified nursing assistant may renew the certificate to allow the nursing assistant to provide, under certain circumstances, certain evidence of completion of a certain nursing assistant training program or a certain refresher training program as required in certain regulations adopted by the State Board of Nursing; and requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/27/2021 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page