Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Utility Service Protection Program - Annual Report - Deadline
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from June 1 to September 1 the date by which the Public Service Commission must report each year to the General Assembly on terminations of gas or electric service occurring during the previous heating season.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0075
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {633421/1 Adopted
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
6
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/11/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/10/2013 1/11/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/14/2013 1/14/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 4
Senate 1/14/2013 1/14/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {633421/1 Adopted 4
Senate 1/14/2013 1/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 4
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 6
House 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 7
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Returned Passed 49
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM