Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - U.S. Route 15
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to seek to execute a memorandum of understanding with the Federal Highway Administration stating that the Authority may collect tolls on U.S. Route 15 in a specified manner and use the toll revenue to finance specified improvements to U.S. Route 15; requiring the Authority to submit a report including specified information if the Authority determines that a memorandum of understanding that satisfies specified requirements cannot be executed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2013
Legislative Date
1/07/2013
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/11/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2013 1/07/2013 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM