Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Pinsky, Bates, Kagan, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, and Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program; providing for the composition of the Task Force including one representative each from the Public School Superintendents Association of Maryland, the Maryland State Education Association, and the Maryland School Psychologists' Association; requiring the Task Force to study specified matters and to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 30, 2015, to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0278
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0871 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/20/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2015
Legislative Date
1/07/2015
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795762/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/05/2015 11/20/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/07/2015 1/07/2015 Hearing 1/22 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {114734/1 Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Senate 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 13
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {795762/1 Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) 57
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM