Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly committing specified acts related to rehoming a minor; providing that a person who violates specified prohibitions in the Act is guilty of the felony of human trafficking; prohibiting a person other than the Department of Human Resources or a child placement agency from advertising regarding the placement or acceptance of a child for adoption; authorizing an individual who believes a child is not living with a specified legal custodian to notify a specified department or enforcement agency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1484
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0208 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/03/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/03/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-301, 11-303 )
(   5-3A-46, 5-3B-33, 5-704.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM