Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the process for and circumstances under which a banking institution may engage in any additional activity, service, or other practice that is authorized for national banking associations; requiring a banking institution to provide written notice to the Commissioner of Financial Regulation at least 45 calendar days before engaging in any additional activity, service, or other practice; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2019
Legislative Date
9/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2019 9/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM