Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration and Renewal Instructions
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to provide a certain notice of the impending expiration of a certain handgun permit and certain renewal instructions to a holder of a certain handgun permit at least 60 days before the expiration of the permit; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2023.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Notice of Expiration and Renewal Instructions
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page