Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Issuance, Renewal, and Cancellation of Policies - Authority
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Middleton, Kittleman, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company to issue policies for employer's liability insurance and insurance under a federal compensation law; providing an exception to a specified prohibition to allow the Company to cancel or refuse to renew or issue a policy for failure to reimburse the Company under a policy with deductibles as required under a specified provision of law; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0039
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/11/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937174/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/11/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {937174/1 Report Adopted 9
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9
Senate 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 11
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 13
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-304, 24-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM