Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County - Board of Education - Student Members
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of student members of the Talbot County Board of Education from one member to two members; requiring that one student member be a student from St. Michaels High School and one student member be a student from Easton High School in Talbot County; and making specified conforming changes.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0226
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/08/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/08/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 10
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 13
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-12A-01, 3-12A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM