Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Application
Sponsored by
Senators Hough and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a firearm application contain a copy of the applicant's handgun qualification license; and requiring that a firearm application contain the applicant's handgun qualification license number, with a specified exception.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0162
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0184 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/18/2016
Legislative Date
7/18/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Firearm Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Firearm Application
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/18/2016 7/18/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Application
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 23
Text - Third - Public Safety - Firearm Application
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Judiciary 28
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Firearm Application
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM