Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget; specifying that the purpose of the Workgroup is to study, evaluate, and make recommendations concerning budgeting models used by state or local governments in the United States that utilize well-defined service categories to set budget funding priorities and allocate resources; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; terminating the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0192 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/16/2018
Legislative Date
11/16/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2019
Legislative Date
1/03/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/16/2018 11/16/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM