Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Forehand, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual temporarily authorized by a clerk of a circuit court to perform a specific marriage ceremony in the State; establishing that the authority of a specified individual to perform a marriage ceremony expires at a specified time; and authorizing the Court of Appeals to adopt rules to implement the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0542
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/12/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/12/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2014 1/09/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-406, 2-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM