Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City School Police Force - Carrying of Firearms - Scope
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a Baltimore City school police officer to carry a firearm on the premises of a Baltimore City public school and any other property used for an educational purpose owned, leased, or operated by, or under the control of the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0101
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2015
Legislative Date
1/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2015 1/15/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-318 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM