Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - Revision
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from 1 year to 5 years, the number of years after the date of an open session a public body is required to keep a copy of minutes of the open session and any recording made under specified provisions of law; requiring specified public bodies to post online minutes or recordings, to the extent practicable; providing that a public body need not prepare minutes of an open session if live and archived video or audio streaming is available, or the public body votes on legislation and the votes are posted promptly on the Internet; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0984
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/11/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234235/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/11/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {234235/1 Report Adopted 20
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 24
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 55
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-206, 3-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM